U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00044-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Behmard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Compassionate Release FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 26, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.