U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Release or Detention Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.