U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.