U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castanon-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Stipulation]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.