U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.