U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caudill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Corrected Image/Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Addendum to Petition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Request for Modification to Conditions of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.