U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kamara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Petition for Travel - District Judge]
  • March 20, 2025: [Petition for Travel - District Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.