U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velazquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Calendar Call]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Regarding Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.