U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valrey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Change of Plea]
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.