U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nagel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Reduce Sentence - Amendmnt 821 or 782]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.