U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2024: [Bond]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • October 08, 2024: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Designation of Retained Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.