U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fiore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Vacate Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Re Jury Meals]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.