U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendrix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2024: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • October 08, 2024: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • October 08, 2024: [Bond]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • October 07, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.