U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spurlock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Corrected Image/Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Strike]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Seek Death Penalty]
  • April 10, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • April 10, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Continue Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 03, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • April 03, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Strike]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice Waiver of Right to Appear In Person at Criminal Proceeding]
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Suppress]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Manual Filing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Sever Defendant or Counts]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 09, 2024: [Minute Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.