U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortes-Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Discovery Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.