U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea - Waiver of Indictment/Venue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Consent to a Presentence Investigation]
  • March 31, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment/Arr & Plea Minute Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 10, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.