U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Downward/Upward Departure]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.