U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00113-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [RISE Court]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.