U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brose
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.