U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Joint Discovery Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 12, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.