U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arce-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 13, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.