U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humphrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Transmittal of Probation/Supervised Release - IN]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Accepting Jurisdiction Transfer of Prob/SR]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.