U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.