U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Release or Detention Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Manual Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion DJ Review of MJ Release or Detention Order LCR 12-3]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Petition for Warrant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Corrected Image/Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Prob12C - Petition for Warrant/Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.