U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Release or Detention Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.