U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Assigning/Reassigning Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Cases]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Transmittal of Probation/Supervised Release - IN]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Accepting Jurisdiction Transfer of Prob/SR]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Order Submission]
  • March 20, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.