U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice Contact Probation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea - Waiver of Indictment/Venue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum / ad Testificandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 20, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.