U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Early Termination of Supervised Release/Probation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Early Termination of Supervised Release/Probation]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice: Attorney Action Required]
  • March 21, 2025: [Verified Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.