U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00610
  • Case Name: Holman v. Dudek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 18, 2025: [QC Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 04, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.