U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00609
  • Case Name: Hipwood et al v. Navarrete-Pureco
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice Related Cases]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 03, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.