U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Singh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Governments Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • April 03, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.