U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Recinos-Valdez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.