U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02027
  • Case Name: C. v. MGM Resorts International et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 13, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 09, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP]
  • April 03, 2025: [QC Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.