U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA VS Jeffrey Leigh Thurber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Clerks Notice Reassign Judge]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Early Termination of Supervised Release/Probation]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.