U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00608
  • Case Name: Massi v. Capital One, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice Other]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 03, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.