U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Wood v. Wood et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Reconsider]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice Change of Address]
  • May 06, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Receipt Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Change of Address]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2025: [Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas]
  • April 04, 2025: [Receipt Initiating Documents]
  • April 04, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.