U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00607
  • Case Name: Nnebe v. Aidvantage
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Pro Se Correspondence Minute Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent for Electronic Service of Documents]
  • April 04, 2025: [Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.