U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00614
  • Case Name: Tellis v. SPECTRUM BRANDS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 05, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Summons to be issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.