U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00615
  • Case Name: Reilly v. Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.