U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Findlay ARN, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.