U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00624
  • Case Name: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company v. Lowrey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • May 08, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Standing Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Interpleader Deposit Disputed Ownership Funds]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.