U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00618
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Hospital Corporation of America - Far West Division et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [ENE Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.