U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00629
  • Case Name: Iida v. JOHNNY & ASSOCIATES, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition Removal Amended]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.