U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00628
  • Case Name: Tanaka v. Johnny & Associates, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 23, 2025: [Petition Removal Amended]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Show Cause]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 15, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.