U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12033-mkn
  • Case Name: HARVEY HENRY THIBAULT, IV and VANESSA ASHLEY SAN JUAN-THIBAULT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Declaration (BK)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Voluntary Petition 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.