U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00617
  • Case Name: Han v. Legacy House of Summerlin, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 08, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.