U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00634
  • Case Name: Heagens v. Ganon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Quash]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [QC Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Remand to State Court]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 09, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 08, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.