U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00631
  • Case Name: Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. v. 3551 and 3371 N Buffalo Owner LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 09, 2025: [Errata]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Petition for Removal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Bond]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 09, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proposed Summons to be issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.