U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00361
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Marks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint Amended]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.