U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Danielson v. Tesla, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.